MD SB654 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on specified issues related to the classification of and penalties for criminal and civil violations in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Reports