MD SB656 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an additional 5% tax credit under the historic revitalization tax credit program for commercial rehabilitations that qualify as opportunity zone projects; altering the definition of "small commercial project" to include certain residential units sold as part of a development project and certain targeted projects; making the credit transferable and refundable under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor in fiscal years 2018 through 2024 to include in the budget bill an appropriation to the Reserve Fund; etc.
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {319236/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Boundaries
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Enterprise Zones
Fees
Governor
Historical Matters
Housing
Industry and Technology
Planning, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Boundaries
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Enterprise Zones
Fees
Governor
Historical Matters
Housing
Industry and Technology
Planning, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Zoning and Planning