MD SB661 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing community schools in the State for the purpose of providing an integrated focus on academics, health and social services, youth and community development, and familial and community engagement; requiring a community school to have a community school coordinator with responsibility for developing and implementing a plan based on an assessment of needs for the community school; authorizing local school systems to form a school-community partnership for the planning and implementation of a community school; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {885762/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {524131/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0661&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0661f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0661t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0661e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_529_sb0661e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0661_52413101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0661_88576201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0661.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0661_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0639.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0661_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1239.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1221.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback