MD SB662 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include a certain amount in the State budget to the Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education for fiscal years 2021 through 2026 to increase the number of green schools in the State; specifying the purposes for which the funds may be used; requiring that an annual evaluation be conducted in calendar years 2022 through 2027 by an independent contractor with experience evaluating environmental programs; requiring that the evaluation examine certain issues and be provided to certain persons; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-32) (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (103-32)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {399431/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback