MD SB667 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Class L, beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a holder of a manufacturer's license; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell or provide samples of certain beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption; establishing the Class D (on-sale) beer and wine Arts and Entertainment District license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board to issue the license to a for-profit festival promoter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {414334/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback