MD SB670 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a student loan servicer from employing any scheme, device, or artifice to mislead a student loan borrower; prohibiting a student loan servicer from engaging in any unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice toward any person; prohibiting a student loan servicer from knowingly or recklessly misapplying or refusing to correct a misapplication of a payment from a student loan borrower; requiring a student loan servicer to acknowledge receipt of a written inquiry or complaint from a certain borrower within 10 days; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Economic Matters
2019-03-25HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-21SenateFloor Amendment {673224/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFloor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky) Withdrawn
2019-03-20SenateSpecial Order until 3/21 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFloor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky)
2019-03-19SenateSpecial Order until 3/20 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky)
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {787879/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-03-08SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback