MD SB671 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Well Drillers to set certain fees in a manner that will produce funds sufficient to cover the actual direct and indirect costs of regulating the well drilling industry; continuing the Board in accordance with the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-4) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
2019-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (135-4)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-27HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback