MD SB673 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB516
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions creating the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists Fund; and requiring the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists to pay money collected for its services into the General Fund of the State.
Title
State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB673 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Appropriations
HB1484 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1484 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fees
Health Occupations
Revenue and Taxes
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fees
Health Occupations
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 21 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 21 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |