MD SB68 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting certain credit services businesses from certain information statement requirements when the credit services business is engaged to obtain an extension of credit for a consumer; requiring credit services businesses engaged in obtaining a credit extension for a consumer to provide the consumer with certain information and a copy of the contract between the credit services business and the consumer before the consumer executes the contract; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-02-20SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {807374/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-01-09SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-10-25SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback