MD SB690 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the elements of the prohibitions against human trafficking and renaming them sex trafficking; prohibiting a person from knowingly taking another for prostitution by use of or intent to use force, threat, coercion, or fraud; prohibiting a person from knowingly engaging in certain conduct with the intent to compel another to marry any person under certain circumstances; classifying the offense of human trafficking as a crime of violence under certain provisions of law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22
2019-04-04SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {382210/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0690&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0690f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0690t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0690e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_22_sb0690e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0690_38221001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0690.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0690_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0548.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0690_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1059.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1138.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback