MD SB693 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the applicability of certain security breach investigation requirements to certain businesses; altering the applicability of certain security breach notification requirements to a certain owner or licensee of computerized data to allow notification to national information security organizations created for information-sharing and analysis of security threats, to alert and avert new or expanded breaches; prohibiting a certain business from charging a certain owner or licensee of computerized data a certain fee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 295
2019-04-01SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {687976/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-03-08SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback