MD SB693 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the pay rate for employees who are not receiving a forensic pay premium at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital be at least a two grades higher than the employee's pay rate effective June 30, 2020; requiring that the pay rate for certain employees in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities Administration be equal to the pay rate effective on July 1, 2020, for similarly trained, qualified, or licensed employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-11) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {727270/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Finance) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1474 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Collective Bargaining
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 8 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |