MD SB699 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from denying an individual access to a home- and community-based services waiver due to a lack of funding for waiver services if the individual is living at home or in the community at a certain time, received certain services, will be or has been terminated from the Maryland Medical Assistance Program due to certain entitlement or enrollment, meets certain eligibility criteria, and certain services received by the individual would qualify for certain funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-29HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {787476/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback