MD SB704 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying a certain time frame within which a certain franchisor is required to notify a franchisee of an intention to terminate or refuse to renew a beer franchise agreement; exempting certain franchisors from a prohibition against terminating or refusing to continue to renew a beer franchise agreement without good cause under certain circumstances; providing for the submission of a certain matter to arbitration and for its application and enforcement in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-03-22SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-22SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
2019-03-19HouseFloor Amendment {923024/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18HouseMotion Special Order until next session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Withdrawn
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {393497/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {454637/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0704&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0704f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0704t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0704e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0704_45463701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0704_39349701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0704_92302401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0704.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0704_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0517.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0704_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0839.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0750.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback