MD SB705 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain insurers, based solely on the status of an applicant or individual status as an organ donor, from taking certain actions relating to certain insurance policies; prohibiting certain insurers from prohibiting an applicant or individual from donating an organ as a condition of insurance; providing that certain employees are entitled to a certain number of business days of unpaid organ donation leave in a 12-month period under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {377879/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Discrimination
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Labor and Industry, Division of
Leave
Organ Donorship
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Labor and Industry, Division of
Leave
Organ Donorship
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor and Employment