MD SB707 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a temporary in-transit registration that allows a nonresident owner of a vehicle to operate the vehicle on a highway in the State only for the purpose of transporting the vehicle to a jurisdiction outside the State for titling and registration; establishing that the Administration or licensed title service agents may issue temporary in-transit registrations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles - Temporary In-Transit Registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {680710/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {848071/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0707&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0707f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0707t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0707e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_287_sb0707e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_84807101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_68071001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0707.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0707_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0559.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0707_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1347.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1248.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback