MD SB707 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland to review the need for additional funding, training, and other resources necessary to increase diversity and inclusion in the tourism industry in the State; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {477378/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Job Training
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sunset
Tourism
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Job Training
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sunset
Tourism