MD SB709 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain person operating on behalf of a venue or an entertainment event to use the word "official" in a certain lower- level domain name; and requiring certain ticket resellers to use the word "reseller" in the lower-level domain name in the URL of a ticket website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-05SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback