MD SB718 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "total direct costs" to include certain compensation for writers, directors, or producers; increasing to $20,000,000 the maximum amount of tax credits that the Secretary of Commerce may issue in a fiscal year; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0718?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0718f.pdf |