MD SB719 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the membership of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to include the Secretary of Commerce ex officio, one member each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House, and one additional student member; requiring the Board to make certain meetings available to the public by live and archived video streaming; requiring the Board to review certain annual financial disclosure statements; requiring the Board to provide education and training on its governance policies; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345
2019-04-04SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {304168/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {874030/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0719&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0719f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0719t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0719e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_345_sb0719e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0719_87403001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0719_30416801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0719.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0719_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0518.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0719_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1134.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1169.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback