MD SB722 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program to include loans for environmental remediation projects intended to remove environmental or health hazards and for resiliency projects to increase the capacity of a structure or infrastructure to withstand the effects of climate change; adding environmental remediation and resiliency projects to the items requiring eligibility requirements under a certain ordinance; requiring that certain loan terms include a provision requiring that a loan be repaid over a certain term; etc.
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Environmental Remediation and Resiliency Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {434739/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Asbestos
Commercial Property
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Renewable Energy Sources
Commercial Property
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Renewable Energy Sources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |