MD SB728 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the distribution of certain sales and use tax revenue; altering the definition of "vendor", under the sales and use tax, to include certain marketplace facilitators and marketplace sellers; requiring a marketplace facilitator to collect the sales and use tax on certain sales to a buyer in the State; providing that a marketplace facilitator is not liable for a failure to collect certain sales and use taxes except under certain circumstances; requiring certain out-of-state sellers to pay the tobacco tax on certain items; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-32) (Y: 106 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (106-32)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {465665/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {969031/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0728&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0728f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0728t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0728e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0728_96903102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0728_46566501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0728.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0728_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0816.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0728_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1240.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1183.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback