MD SB729 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology, in consultation with the Departments of Natural Resources, the Environment, Planning, and Agriculture and the Chesapeake Bay Program to conduct a technical study to review changes in forest cover and tree canopy in the State; providing for the scope of the study; and requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology to submit a report of the findings of the technical study to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-26) (Y: 112 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (112-26)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {670518/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {544231/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0729&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0729f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0729t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0729e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_405_sb0729e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0729_54423101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0729_67051801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0729.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0729_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0674.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0729_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0973.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0937.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback