MD SB729 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from conducting or contracting for animal testing in the development of a cosmetic; prohibiting a manufacturer from selling or offering for sale in the State a cosmetic under certain circumstances beginning July 1, 2021; providing that certain provisions of the Act do not apply to certain animal testing; prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting or enforcing provisions of local law relating to animal testing on cosmetics; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; etc.
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {557272/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Animals
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Political Parties
Public Health
Records
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State's Attorneys
Time
Animals
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Political Parties
Public Health
Records
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State's Attorneys
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 21 | 1215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 259.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |