MD SB732 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a court to issue a certain order on request of a local department of social services that has been granted certain guardianship over a child in need of assistance to have control over the property of the child for the purpose of establishing an individual savings account, an ABLE account under certain circumstances, or a pooled special needs trust on behalf of the child; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {168379/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback