MD SB733 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a licensed physician, under certain circumstances and in accordance with certain regulations, to delegate certain duties to a registered cardiovascular invasive specialist assisting in the physician's performance of a fluoroscopy; establishing that the hospital in which a certain laboratory is located and the physician delegating the acts are responsible for ensuring that certain requirements are met; authorizing the State Board of Physicians to impose a certain civil penalty; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Physicians - Registered Cardiovascular Invasive Specialists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback