MD SB735 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a cash balance plan under the State Retirement and Pension System; providing that certain individuals are not eligible to participate in the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System if they elect to participate in the cash balance plan; providing that certain individuals are not eligible to participate in the optional retirement program if they elect to participate in the cash balance plan; authorizing participation in the cash balance plan for certain individuals hired on or after July 1, 2020; etc.
Title
State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Beneficiaries
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Counties
Education, Boards of
Elderly Persons
Elections Supervisors
Governor
Interest
Law Enforcement
Libraries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Schools
Registers of Wills
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Sheriffs
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Universities and Colleges
State's Attorneys
Teachers
Time
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Beneficiaries
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Counties
Education, Boards of
Elderly Persons
Elections Supervisors
Governor
Interest
Law Enforcement
Libraries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Schools
Registers of Wills
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Sheriffs
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Universities and Colleges
State's Attorneys
Teachers
Time