MD SB735 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the crime of sodomy; clarifying that certain evidence is not admissible as an infamous crime; and providing that a certain conviction may not be expunged under certain circumstances.
Title
Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {858575/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB81 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |