MD SB736 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the hours during which specified licensees in Cecil County may sell specified alcoholic beverages on Sunday; exempting specified holders of specified classes of beer, wine and liquor licenses from paying a specified license fee under specified circumstances; authorizing specified licensees to conduct specified sales of specified alcoholic beverages within specified times; authorizing specified licensees to permit the use and consumption of alcoholic beverages between specified hours on specified days; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensed Establishments - Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |