MD SB744 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of annual compensation of the president of the Frederick County Board of Education, from $11,000 to $15,000, and of the other voting members, from $10,000 to $14,000, beginning with the commencement on December 6, 2022, of the term of office of members of the county board elected in the general election of 2022.
Title
Frederick County - Board of Education - Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 364 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB909 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363
Subjects
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Frederick County
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Voting
Education, Boards of
Elections
Frederick County
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Voting