MD SB747 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising, restating, and recodifying the laws of the State relating to the Maryland Technology Development Corporation; making certain technical and stylistic changes; providing for the construction of the Act; authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code to make certain corrections in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes