MD SB748 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Generally curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title defects.
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Senate Rules |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 24 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 928 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 9 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 2 | 1235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |