MD SB749 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting certain errors or omissions in certain articles of the Annotated Code and in certain uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting certain obsolete references; reorganizing certain sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying certain corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; providing for the correction of certain errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code; etc.
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Senate Rules |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |