MD SB751 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a trustee to invest money of a trust account for a pre-need contract in specified securities; and requiring the income of the trust account to remain in the trust account, be reinvested and compounded, and be disbursed only for payment of specified fees, commissions, and other costs of the trust account.
Title
Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |