MD SB752 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; establishing a Restaurant Meals Program (RMP) within the food supplement program in the Department of Human Services to expand food access to certain individuals; providing that a certain household is eligible to participate in the RMP if the household is eligible for certain State and federal benefits and lacks a fixed, regular, and adequate nighttime residence and includes certain persons; requiring a restaurant to meet certain requirements to participate; etc.
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-35) (Y: 105 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-35) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {177077/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Disabilities
Disabled
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Food Stamps
Human Services, Department of
Minors
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Disabled
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Food Stamps
Human Services, Department of
Minors
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset