MD SB754 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding certain sources of revenue required to be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund; requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to pay certain fines and penalties into the General Fund of the State; altering certain provisions on the regulation of money transmission by the Commissioner; authorizing the Commissioner to identify certain activities as money transmission for certain purposes; establishing licensing requirements for certain money transmission locations; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867279/1 Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867279/1 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Banks and Trust Companies
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Credit Unions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Damages
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Emergencies
Equipment
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Fingerprinting
Forms
Fraud
Gaming
Hearings
Identification
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Mobile Devices
Notices
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Savings and Loan Associations
Security Interests
Signatures
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Violence
Auditors and Audits
Banks and Trust Companies
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Credit Unions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Damages
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Emergencies
Equipment
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Fingerprinting
Forms
Fraud
Gaming
Hearings
Identification
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Mobile Devices
Notices
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Savings and Loan Associations
Security Interests
Signatures
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Violence