MD SB759 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the manner in which the State Board of Elections is authorized to impose fees for the late filing of certain statements of contributions by persons doing public business; requiring certain persons who violate certain provisions of law requiring disclosure of contributions by persons doing public business to pay a civil penalty in accordance with certain provisions of the Act; prohibiting a certain penalty from exceeding $5,000; etc.
Title
Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-36) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (114-19) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {335360/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {753925/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {393222/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {393222/1 (Senator Hough) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB951 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Citations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disclosure
District Courts
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Gifts
Jurisdiction
Liability
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Trials
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disclosure
District Courts
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Gifts
Jurisdiction
Liability
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Trials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 14 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 14 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 14 | 107.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 14 | 107.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |