MD SB766 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to provide technical assistance and training to county boards of education regarding the use of restorative approaches under certain circumstances; requiring certain regulations adopted by a county board to incorporate the use of restorative approaches and to state that the primary purpose of any disciplinary measure is rehabilitative, restorative, and educational; requiring that a student discipline data report be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly by October 1 each year; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-17) (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (20-24) (Y: 20 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (20-24) (Y: 20 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-17) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (20-24) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {624431/1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {624431/1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Demographics
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Examinations
Harassment
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Mediation
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Threats
Violence
Communications
Data
Demographics
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Examinations
Harassment
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Mediation
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Threats
Violence