MD SB77 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction, on taking custody of an inmate and with the inmate's written consent, to begin the process of obtaining the inmate's birth certificate; requiring the Commissioner to return certain documents to the inmate on the inmate's release; requiring each local correctional facility to develop and implement a policy for assisting inmates to obtain identification cards issued by the Motor Vehicle Administration; requiring that a certain report be made to the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Important Documents and Identification Cards – Inmates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578574/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1553 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Communications
Correction, Division of
Correctional Institutions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drivers' Licenses
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Prerelease and Reentry
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vital Records
Correction, Division of
Correctional Institutions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drivers' Licenses
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Prerelease and Reentry
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 9 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 9 | 609.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 12 | 301.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |