MD SB778 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain persons to record electronically a release related to motor vehicle liens with the Motor Vehicle Administration within 5 business days; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Administration to develop and implement an electronic system for recording and releasing security interests; authorizing the Administration to make certain information available electronically; authorizing certain parties to submit to the Administration certain electronic lien information on behalf of certain other parties; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1033 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Subjects
Commercial Law - Generally
Electronic Communication
Liens
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Public Information
Records
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Titles
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Electronic Communication
Liens
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Public Information
Records
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Titles
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 12 | 1024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 12 | 622 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 108.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |