MD SB780 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying certain provisions of law relating to the application of the transfer tax to certain instruments of writing that transfer property from or to certain governmental entities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer Tax - Transfers by Governmental Entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback