MD SB783 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a health care provider, before each administration of a human papillomavirus vaccine, to provide an individual with a certain information sheet and obtain written consent on a certain form; requiring that a certain information sheet include, at a minimum, certain statements; requiring that a certain consent form developed by the Maryland Department of Health include certain information; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Archives
Communications
Data
Death
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Ethics
Forms
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Human Rights
Immunization
Language
Liability
Licenses
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signatures
State Documents
Communications
Data
Death
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Ethics
Forms
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Human Rights
Immunization
Language
Liability
Licenses
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signatures
State Documents