MD SB79 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a regulated lobbyist to file a registration and certain reports electronically with the State Ethics Commission; altering the manner in which a lobbyist is required to file a certain report with the Department of Legislative Services; repealing a requirement that the Department of Legislative Services forward a certain report to the State Ethics Commission; and altering a requirement that the State Ethics Commission develop certain procedures regarding electronic filing of certain reports filed by regulated lobbyists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-01-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-01-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-01-14SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-01-14SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-07SenateHearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-01-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-07SenateHearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-10-02SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback