MD SB79 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "video lottery facility" to include a casino for the purposes of the federal Bank Secrecy Act of 1970 and its related regulations; and altering the definitions of "video lottery facility" and "video lottery operation license" to include the operation of table games.
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |