MD SB790 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declaring that it is the policy of the State that any donor may make an anatomical gift during the life of the donor for transplantation, therapy, research, or education, regardless of age, ethnicity, or medical history.
Title
Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Donors - Policy of the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |