MD SB794 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the county boards of education in Caroline, Dorchester, Kent, Queen Anne's, and Talbot counties to establish a regional Career and Technical Education (CTE) school to provide career and technical education programs to public high school students in the counties; requiring a regional CTE school to operate under the terms of a certain collective bargaining agreement; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to study and develop a certain cost-share formula for certain county boards of education; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (130-1) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {675964/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB603 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Caroline County
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dorchester County
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Queen Anne's County
Reports
State Aid
Talbot County
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dorchester County
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Queen Anne's County
Reports
State Aid
Talbot County