MD SB798 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law regarding educational programs for juveniles in residential facilities; establishing a Juvenile Services Education System; establishing the Board of Education for the Juvenile Services Education System; requiring the Board to have the authority and responsibility for all functions relating to the juvenile services educations programs in the State beginning July 1, 2021; requiring each county board of education to pay to the Board a certain cost for certain juveniles; etc.
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1513 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Subjects
Age
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Contracts
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Language
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Officials
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
School Testing
Social Workers
Teachers
Time
Voting
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Contracts
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Language
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Officials
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
School Testing
Social Workers
Teachers
Time
Voting
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 22 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0798?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0798f.pdf |