MD SB799 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "Baltimore Convention site"; requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City to enter into an agreement to begin in fiscal year 2020 the planning and design of the expansion or renovation of the Baltimore Convention facility; and specifying that the agreement include a provision allocating two-thirds of the costs for planning and design to the Authority and one-third of the costs to Baltimore City.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {429931/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Construction
Contracts
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Local Government Mandates
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Stadium Authority
Baltimore City
Construction
Contracts
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Local Government Mandates
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Stadium Authority