MD SB799 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring units of the Maryland Department of Labor to waive certain application fees for certain applicants who hold valid out-of-state licenses in good standing from a state whose licensure requirements exceed or are substantially equivalent to the requirements of this State; authorizing a unit to adopt regulations to carry out certain provisions of this Act; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Occupational Licenses - Waiver of Application Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Age
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Fees
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Spouses
Work, Labor and Employment
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Fees
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Spouses
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 2 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |