MD SB801 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of a Class 5 brewery license to brew and bottle malt beverages at a location listed on an individual storage permit; authorizing a local licensing board to conditionally grant an applicant an on-site consumption permit or a Class D beer license that will become effective after the applicant meets certain requirements; authorizing a holder of a micro-brewery license to hold another license; altering the amount of beer that certain manufacturers may sell; etc.
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564638/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Comptroller
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Reports
Retail Sales
Storage
Time
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Comptroller
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Reports
Retail Sales
Storage
Time
Weights and Measures